US SR515 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S711-712)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S711-712)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of "Career and Technical Education Month".
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of "Career and Technical Education Month".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S711-712) |
Same As/Similar To
HR99 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR923 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR91 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1032-1033)
HR923 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR91 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1032-1033)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/515/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres515/BILLS-117sres515ats.pdf |