US SR513 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating September 25, 2016, as "National Lobster Day". Designates September 25, 2016, as National Lobster Day.
Title
A resolution designating September 25, 2016, as "National Lobster Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5011) |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4651) |
Same As/Similar To
SR230 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Commemorative events and holidays
Food industry and services
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Commemorative events and holidays
Food industry and services
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood