US SR511 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3016-3017; text: CR S3017)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution supporting the role of the United States in helping save the lives of children and protecting the health of people in developing countries with vaccines and immunization through GAVI, the Vaccine Alliance. This resolution commends the work of the Global Alliance for Vaccines and Immunization (GAVI) to expand access to vaccines and immunizations in developing countries, affirms U.S. support for GAVI, and encourages continued collaboration with GAVI to introduce and sustain the use of new and underused vaccines in immunization programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution supporting the role of the United States in helping save the lives of children and protecting the health of people in developing countries with vaccines and immunization through GAVI, the Vaccine Alliance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3016-3017; text: CR S3017)
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 469.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1227-1228)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback