US SR486 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S642-643)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S642-643)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for observing National Trafficking and Modern Slavery Prevention Month during the period of January 1-February 1, 2020.
Title
A resolution supporting the observation of National Trafficking and Modern Slavery Prevention Month during the period beginning on January 1, 2020, and ending on February 1, 2020, to raise awareness of, and opposition to, human trafficking and modern slavery.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S642-643) |
Same As/Similar To
HR48 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR36 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 1/31/2019 S810-811)
SR36 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 1/31/2019 S810-811)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Human rights
Human trafficking
Intergovernmental relations
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Human rights
Human trafficking
Intergovernmental relations
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/486/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres486/BILLS-116sres486is.pdf |