US SR483 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443; text: CR S2441)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443; text: CR S2441)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the contributions of senior volunteers and designating the week of April 29 through May 5, 2018, as "National Senior Corps Week". Designates the week of April 29-May 5, 2018, as National Senior Corps Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the contributions of senior volunteers and designating the week of April 29 through May 5, 2018, as "National Senior Corps Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443; text: CR S2441) |
Same As/Similar To
SR164 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
HR859 (Related) 2018-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR859 (Related) 2018-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Corporation for National and Community Service
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Corporation for National and Community Service
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/483/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres483/BILLS-115sres483ats.pdf |