US SR465 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5550-5551)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing support for the designation of November 20, 2023, through December 20, 2023, as "National Survivors of Homicide Victims Awareness Month".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing support for the designation of November 20, 2023, through December 20, 2023, as "National Survivors of Homicide Victims Awareness Month".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-15SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5550-5551)

Same As/Similar To

HR879 (Related) 2023-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback