US SR456 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for a free, fair, and peaceful December 4, 2021, election in The Gambia.
Title
A resolution expressing support for a free, fair, and peaceful December 4, 2021, election in The Gambia.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.5031 Amendment SA 5031 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.5031 Amendment SA 5031 proposed by Senator Cantwell for Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S2461; text: CR S2461) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.5032 Amendment SA 5032 proposed by Senator Cantwell for Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S2461; text: CR S2461-2462) To amend the preamble. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.5032 Amendment SA 5032 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2462) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2460-2462) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 339. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S8454) |