US SR454 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2921-2922; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2922)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution calling for the immediate release of Cuban democracy activist Jose Daniel Ferrer and commending the efforts of Jose Daniel Ferrer to promote human rights and fundamental freedoms in Cuba. This resolution condemns the conviction, sentencing, and imprisonment of Cuban democracy and human rights activist Jose Daniel Ferrer and calls for the release of Ferrer and all members of the Patriotic Union of Cuba (UNPACU). The resolution further commends Ferrer and recognizes the contributions of UNPACU for advancing human rights and fundamental freedoms in Cuba.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution calling for the immediate release of Cuban democracy activist Jose Daniel Ferrer and commending the efforts of Jose Daniel Ferrer to promote human rights and fundamental freedoms in Cuba.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2921-2922; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2922)
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-12-12SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S7031-7032)

Same As/Similar To

HR774 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback