US SR423 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating February 28, 2018, as "Rare Disease Day". Designates February 28, 2018, as Rare Disease Day. Expresses support for a national and global commitment to developing new treatments, diagnostics, and cures for rare diseases and disorders.
Title
A resolution designating February 28, 2018, as "Rare Disease Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319) |
Same As/Similar To
HR157 (Related) 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR73 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1505-1506)
SR73 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1505-1506)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/423/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres423/BILLS-115sres423ats.pdf |