US SR414 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7004)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7004)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 16, 2021, and October 16, 2022, as "World Food Day".
Title
A resolution designating October 16, 2021, and October 16, 2022, as "World Food Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7004) |
Same As/Similar To
HR703 (Related) 2021-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/414/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres414/BILLS-117sres414ats.pdf |