US SR392 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3014-3015; text: CR S3015)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3014-3015; text: CR S3015)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution celebrates the U.S. partnership with young leaders in Southeast Asia and recognizes the importance of the Young Southeast Asian Leaders Initiative in advancing U.S. soft power and promoting human rights, democracy, and good governance in the region.
Title
A resolution recognizing the importance of the Young Southeast Asian Leaders Initiative to the relationship between the United States and the member states of the Association of Southeast Asian Nations and to advancing the policy of the United States in the Indo-Pacific region.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3014-3015; text: CR S3015) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 465. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6338-6339) |
Subjects
Area studies and international education
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Policy sciences
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Policy sciences
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status