US SR381 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6666; text: CR S6678-6679)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6666; text: CR S6678-6679)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution proclaiming the week of September 20 through September 24, 2021, to be "National Clean Energy Week".
Title
A resolution proclaiming the week of September 20 through September 24, 2021, to be "National Clean Energy Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6666; text: CR S6678-6679) |
Same As/Similar To
HR668 (Related) 2021-09-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HR1386 (Related) 2022-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SR794 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5031; text: CR S4974)
HR1386 (Related) 2022-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SR794 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5031; text: CR S4974)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/381/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres381/BILLS-117sres381ats.pdf |