US SR380 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S9082-9084; text: CR S9084-9085)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S9082-9084; text: CR S9084-9085)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution reiterating United States support for the people of the Republic of South Sudan in their quest for lasting peace, stability, and democracy after 10 years of independence and calling for a review of United States policy toward South Sudan.
Title
A resolution reiterating United States support for the people of the Republic of South Sudan in their quest for lasting peace, stability, and democracy after 10 years of independence and calling for a review of United States policy toward South Sudan.
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S9082-9084; text: CR S9084-9085) |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6677-6678) |