US SR378 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding the courageous work and life of Russian opposition leader Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov and renewing the call for a full and transparent investigation into the tragic murder of Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov in Moscow on February 27, 2015. Recognizes the legacy of Russian opposition leader Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov, who dedicated his life to fighting corruption and promoting the principles of democracy, rule of law, and the inherent dignity of human beings. Encourages the public release of all surveillance tapes in the area surrounding the crime scene to aid in the investigation. Urges the U.S. government, in official contacts with representatives of the Russian government, to emphasize the importance of bringing to justice all of the conspirators in the murder of Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov. Calls on the President to increase significantly U.S. support for the causes for which Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov gave his life.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding the courageous work and life of Russian opposition leader Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov and renewing the call for a full and transparent investigation into the tragic murder of Boris Yefimovich Nemtsov in Moscow on February 27, 2015.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1088) |
Same As/Similar To
HR697 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Violent crime
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Violent crime