US SR375 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the 75th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the 75th anniversary of the Warsaw Uprising.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198)
2019-12-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 339.
2019-12-17SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2019-12-11SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-10-23SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6095-6096)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback