US SR368 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2499)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2499)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting efforts by the Government of Colombia to pursue peace and the end of the country's enduring internal armed conflict and recognizing United States support for Colombia at the 15th anniversary of Plan Colombia. Reaffirms the support of the government and people of the United States for the people of Colombia in their pursuit of peace. Commends efforts to bring an end to Colombia's internal armed conflict. Maintains the Senate's commitment to the victims of Colombia's armed conflict and urges the negotiating parties to forge an agreement that holds accountable perpetrators of serious violations of human rights and ensures that they are appropriately punished. Encourages the Department of State to develop a comprehensive strategy to ensure the successful implementation of a potential peace accord in Colombia that is endorsed by the Colombian people. Reaffirms the Senate's commitment to continued partnership between the United States and Colombia on issues of mutual security, including counternarcotics cooperation, combating transnational organized crime, and ensuring justice for those who have caused indelible harm to our populations.
Title
A resolution supporting efforts by the Government of Colombia to pursue peace and the end of the country's enduring internal armed conflict and recognizing United States support for Colombia at the 15th anniversary of Plan Colombia.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2499) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 397. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S741-742) |
Subjects
Colombia
Conflicts and wars
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Human rights
International affairs
Latin America
Organized crime
Conflicts and wars
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Human rights
International affairs
Latin America
Organized crime