US SR360 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4748; text: 9/21/2023 CR S4661-4662)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4748; text: 9/21/2023 CR S4661-4662)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of September 25 through September 29, 2023, as "National Hazing Awareness Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week of September 25 through September 29, 2023, as "National Hazing Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4748; text: 9/21/2023 CR S4661-4662) |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S4661-4662) |
Same As/Similar To
HR717 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.