US SR345 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee amendment to the preamble agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee amendment to the preamble agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on the political situation in Belarus.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on the political situation in Belarus.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee amendment to the preamble agreed to by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.4921 Amendment SA 4921 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.4921 Amendment SA 4921 proposed by Senator Menendez for Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S454; text: CR S454) To make technical amendments. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S454-455) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S452-453) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S452-454) |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167. |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6112-6113) |