US SR341 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-16 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7306)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-16 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7306)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week beginning November 13, 2017, as "National Apprenticeship Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning November 13, 2017, as "National Apprenticeship Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7306) |
Same As/Similar To
HR622 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR695 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7062-7063; text: CR S7057-7058)
SR695 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7062-7063; text: CR S7057-7058)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/341/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres341/BILLS-115sres341is.pdf |