US SR34 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1846; text: 2/4/2021 CR S487)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution congratulates the people of Greece as they celebrate the 200th anniversary of Greece's independence. The resolution also expresses support for the principles of democratic governance to which the people of Greece are committed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the 200th anniversary of the independence of Greece and celebrating democracy in Greece and the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1846; text: 2/4/2021 CR S487)
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 17.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-02-04SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HR246 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback