US SR339 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6482)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6482)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of September 25, 2021, as "National Ataxia Awareness Day", and raising awareness of ataxia, ataxia research, and the search for a cure.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of September 25, 2021, as "National Ataxia Awareness Day", and raising awareness of ataxia, ataxia research, and the search for a cure.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6482) |
2021-09-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.3828 Amendment SA 3828 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Murphy. (consideration: CR S6482; text: CR S6482) To amend the preamble. |
2021-09-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.3828 Amendment SA 3828 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6482) |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5951-5952) |
Same As/Similar To
SR850 (Related) 2022-11-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6824-6825, S6829; text: CR S6824-6825)