US SR328 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3898-3899)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3898-3899)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating April 5, 2023, as "Gold Star Wives Day".
Title
A resolution designating April 5, 2023, as "Gold Star Wives Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3898-3899) |
Same As/Similar To
SR121 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S936-937)
SR615 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2552; text: CR S2521)
SR615 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2552; text: CR S2521)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/328/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres328/BILLS-118sres328is.pdf |