US SR327 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of November 5 through 12, 2017, as "National Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Awareness Week". Designates the week of November 5-November 12, 2017, as National Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Awareness Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week of November 5 through 12, 2017, as "National Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-21 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279) |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7159) |
Same As/Similar To
SR296 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6655-6656)
Subjects
Air quality
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health promotion and preventive care