US SR326 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8730; text as passed Senate: CR S8730)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8730; text as passed Senate: CR S8730)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution celebrating the 135th anniversary of diplomatic relations between the United States and Romania. Celebrates the 135th anniversary of U.S.-Romanian diplomatic relations. Congratulates the people of Romania on their accomplishments as a great nation. Expresses appreciation for Romania's partnership with the United States.
Title
A resolution celebrating the 135th anniversary of diplomatic relations between the United States and Romania.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8730; text as passed Senate: CR S8730) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 322. |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8381) |
Same As/Similar To
HR543 (Related) 2016-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
International affairs
Romania
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
International affairs
Romania