US SR318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790-6791; text: 12/10/2019 CR S6955)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790-6791; text: 12/10/2019 CR S6955)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends the Global Fund to Fight AIDS and its partners for their contributions to ending the epidemics of AIDS, tuberculosis, and malaria. The resolution also affirms U.S. support to secure at least $14 billion in donor commitments for the Sixth Global Fund Replenishment.
Title
A resolution to support the Global Fund to fight AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria, and the Sixth Replenishment.
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790-6791; text: 12/10/2019 CR S6955) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 236. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5581) |
Same As/Similar To
HR517 (Related) 2019-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
World health
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
World health