US SR274 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/17/2021 CR S4630)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/17/2021 CR S4630)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 24, 2021, as "National Day of the American Cowboy".
Title
A resolution designating July 24, 2021, as "National Day of the American Cowboy".
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/17/2021 CR S4630) |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5025) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR686 (Related) 2022-07-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3528-3529; text: 06/22/2022 CR S3079)