US SR260 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting the commitment of the United States Agency for International Development to reducing global malnutrition through the Multi-Sectoral Nutrition Strategy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting the commitment of the United States Agency for International Development to reducing global malnutrition through the Multi-Sectoral Nutrition Strategy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198-199)
2019-12-18SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 379.
2019-12-18SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2019-12-11SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2019-06-24SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4460)

Same As/Similar To

HR189 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback