US SR254 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6660; text as passed Senate: CR S6657)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6660; text as passed Senate: CR S6657)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States. Recognizes the celebration of Hispanic Heritage Month from September 15, 2015, through October 15, 2015. Esteems the integral role of Latinos and their manifold heritage in the economy, culture, and identity of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6660; text as passed Senate: CR S6657) |
Same As/Similar To
HR426 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Historical and cultural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Historical and cultural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/254/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres254/BILLS-114sres254ats.pdf |