US SR252 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/19/2019 CR S3849-3850)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/19/2019 CR S3849-3850)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates September 2019 as National Democracy Month.
Title
A resolution designating September 2019 as National Democracy Month as a time to reflect on the contributions of the system of government of the United States to a more free and stable world.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/19/2019 CR S3849-3850) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5759-5760) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR672 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5287)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Government operations and politics
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Government operations and politics
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status