US SR245 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9273)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9273)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calls upon all people in the United States to: (1) observe a National Day of Service and Remembrance on September 11, 2009, in honor of those who lost their lives or were injured in the September 11, 2001, terrorist attacks and in tribute to those who came to the aid of those in need; and (2) continue to live their lives throughout the year with the same spirit of unity, service, and compassion that was exhibited following the attacks.
Title
A resolution recognizing September 11, 2009, as a "National Day of Service and Remembrance".
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Dodd [D-CT] | Sen. Russell Feingold [D-WI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Arlen Specter [D-PA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9273) | |
2009-09-10 | S.AMDT.2327 Amendment SA 2327 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-09-10 | S.AMDT.2327 Amendment SA 2327 proposed by Senator Whitehouse for Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S9273; text: CR S9273)To amend the title. | |
2009-09-10 | S.AMDT.2326 Amendment SA 2326 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-09-10 | S.AMDT.2326 Amendment SA 2326 proposed by Senator Whitehouse for Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S9273; text: CR S9273)To amend the resolving clause. | |
2009-09-10 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9272-9273) | |
2009-08-06 | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9044-9045) |
Same As/Similar To
HR718 (Same As) 2009-09-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Monuments and memorials
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Monuments and memorials
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism