US SR224 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2078-2079; text: CR S2078-2079)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2078-2079; text: CR S2078-2079)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the 6th anniversary of the death of Oswaldo Paya Sardinas, and commemorating his legacy and commitment to democratic values and principles. Commemorates the legacy of Oswaldo Paya Sardinas on the sixth anniversary of his death on July 22, 2018, and honors his commitment to democratic values. Calls on the Cuban government to cease violating human rights and to begin providing democratic political freedoms to its citizens.
Title
A resolution recognizing the 6th anniversary of the death of Oswaldo Paya Sardinas, and commemorating his legacy and commitment to democratic values and principles.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2078-2079; text: CR S2078-2079) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 357. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4084-4085) |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Cuba
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Cuba
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status