US SR222 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 26, 2017, as "United States Intelligence Professionals Day". Supports the designation of a United States Intelligence Professionals Day, and acknowledges the courage, fidelity, sacrifice, and professionalism of the men and women of the U.S. intelligence community.
Title
A resolution designating July 26, 2017, as "United States Intelligence Professionals Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4718) |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4083-4084) |
Same As/Similar To
SR595 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5437-5438; text: CR S5428)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information