US SR217 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3011)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3011)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of June 2019 as National Gun Violence Awareness Month and the designation of June 7-June 9, 2019, as National Gun Violence Awareness Weekend.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 7 through June 9, 2019, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Weekend" and June 2019 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3011) |
Same As/Similar To
HR391 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR977 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR592 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2556)
HR977 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR592 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2556)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/217/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres217/BILLS-116sres217is.pdf |