US SR202 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/29/2021 CR S2370)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/29/2021 CR S2370)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating May 7, 2021, as "United States Foreign Service Day" in recognition of the men and women who have served, or are presently serving, in the Foreign Service of the United States, and honoring the members of the Foreign Service who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Title
A resolution designating May 7, 2021, as "United States Foreign Service Day" in recognition of the men and women who have served, or are presently serving, in the Foreign Service of the United States, and honoring the members of the Foreign Service who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-09 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/29/2021 CR S2370) |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6104) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2370) |
Same As/Similar To
SR627 (Related) 2022-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2407; text: CR S2422)