US SR193 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2367)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2367)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of the week of May 2, 2021, as "Children's Mental Health Awareness Week" and the day of May 9, 2021, as "Children's Mental Health Awareness Day".
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of the week of May 2, 2021, as "Children's Mental Health Awareness Week" and the day of May 9, 2021, as "Children's Mental Health Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2367) |
Same As/Similar To
SR607 (Related) 2022-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2247)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/193/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres193/BILLS-117sres193is.pdf |