US SR188 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - S.Amdt.909 Amendment SA 909 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - S.Amdt.909 Amendment SA 909 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for democratization in Sudan and emphasizes that, until Sudan transitions to a civilian-led government, it will remain on the State Sponsors of Terrorism List and sanctions against the country will continue. The resolution also urges Sudan to pursue accountability for human rights abuses and release all political prisoners.
Title
A resolution encouraging a swift transfer of power by the military to a civilian-led political authority in the Republic of the Sudan, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.909 Amendment SA 909 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.909 Amendment SA 909 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S4737-4738; text: CR S4737-4738) To amend the preamble. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4736-4739; text: CR S4738-4739) |
2019-07-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.908 Amendment SA 908 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.908 Amendment SA 908 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S4736-4737; text: CR S4737) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 106. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2622) |
Subjects
Africa
Conflicts and wars
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Political parties and affiliation
Religion
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Terrorism
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Conflicts and wars
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Political parties and affiliation
Religion
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
Terrorism
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity