US SR180 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of May 5-May 11, 2019, as Public Service Recognition Week.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that, during Public Service Recognition Week, public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575) |
Same As/Similar To
HR353 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR949 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR569 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344)
HR949 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR569 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343-2344)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/180/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres180/BILLS-116sres180ats.pdf |