US SR164 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the contributions of senior volunteers and designating the week of May 15 through 19, 2017, as "National Senior Corps Week". Designates the week of May 15-May 19, 2017, as National Senior Corps Week. Encourages the people of the United States to recognize the contributions of senior volunteers and join in the celebration of National Senior Corps Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the contributions of senior volunteers and designating the week of May 15 through 19, 2017, as "National Senior Corps Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2968; text as passed Senate: CR S2968) |
Same As/Similar To
HR344 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR483 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443; text: CR S2441)
HR859 (Related) 2018-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR483 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443; text: CR S2441)
HR859 (Related) 2018-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Corporation for National and Community Service
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Corporation for National and Community Service
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/164/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres164/BILLS-115sres164ats.pdf |