US SR153 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-2)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728; text: CR S2726-2727)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728; text: CR S2726-2727)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that, during Public Service Recognition Week, public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States. Supports the designation of the week of May 7-May 13, 2017, as Public Service Recognition Week.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that, during Public Service Recognition Week, public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728; text: CR S2726-2727) |
Same As/Similar To
SR495 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2494-2495)
HR867 (Related) 2018-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR867 (Related) 2018-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/153/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres153/BILLS-115sres153ats.pdf |