US SR149 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Independent 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2332-2333)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2332-2333)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) supports the designation of April 8-April 12, 2019, as National Assistant Principals Week, and (2) honors the contributions of assistant principals to the success of students in the United States.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of April 8 through April 12, 2019, as "National Assistant Principals Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2332-2333) |
Same As/Similar To
HR318 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR914 (Related) 2020-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR914 (Related) 2020-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/149/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres149/BILLS-116sres149is.pdf |