US SR142 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S79-80; text: CR S79-80)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S79-80; text: CR S79-80)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) condemns the government of the Philippines for the state-sanctioned extrajudicial killings in its War on Drugs, (2) condemns the government's detention of human rights defenders and Senator Leila De Lima and its harassment of journalists; and (3) calls on the U.S. president to impose sanctions on specified Philippine officials and ensure that human rights conditions in the Philippines are consistent with requirements for security assistance.
Title
A resolution condemning the Government of the Philippines for its continued detention of Senator Leila De Lima, calling for her immediate release, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S79-80; text: CR S79-80) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 365. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2278-2279) |
Same As/Similar To
HR233 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Subjects
Asia
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Philippines
Protest and dissent
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Philippines
Protest and dissent