US SR135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing the gratitude and appreciation of the Senate for the acts of heroism and valor by the members of the United States Armed Forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II. This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing of the allied forces on D-Day, June 6, 1944, at Normandy, France, during World War II. The resolution expresses appreciation to the members of the U.S. Armed Forces who participated in the operations, thanks the young people of Normandy and the United States for their involvement in events celebrating the anniversary of the Normandy landings, recognizes the efforts of France and the people of Normandy to preserve the world heritage represented by the Normandy beaches and the sunken material remains of the landings by inscribing these on the UNESCO World Heritage List, and requests the President to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe the 75th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing the gratitude and appreciation of the Senate for the acts of heroism and valor by the members of the United States Armed Forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200)
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 98.
2019-05-23SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2019-04-02SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2193)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback