US SR123 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S951; text: 03/23/2023 CR S937-938)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the week of March 19 through March 25, 2023, as "National Poison Prevention Week" and encouraging communities across the United States to raise awareness of the dangers of poisoning and promote poison prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the week of March 19 through March 25, 2023, as "National Poison Prevention Week" and encouraging communities across the United States to raise awareness of the dangers of poisoning and promote poison prevention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S951; text: 03/23/2023 CR S937-938)
2023-03-27SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2023-03-23SenateReferred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

SR625 (Related) 2024-03-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2618; text: CR S2606)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback