US SR114 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: 3/15/2021 CR S1529)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: 3/15/2021 CR S1529)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution commending the United States African Development Foundation on the occasion of its 40th anniversary for creating pathways to prosperity for underserved communities on the African continent through community-led development.
Title
A resolution commending the United States African Development Foundation on the occasion of its 40th anniversary for creating pathways to prosperity for underserved communities on the African continent through community-led development.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: 3/15/2021 CR S1529) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR496 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.