US SR105 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the 194th anniversary of the independence of Greece and celebrating democracy in Greece and the United States. Congratulates the people of Greece as they celebrate the 194th anniversary of the independence of Greece. Supports the principles of democratic governance to which the people of Greece are committed. Notes Greece's important role in the wider European region and in the community of nations since gaining its independence 194 years ago.
Title
A resolution recognizing the 194th anniversary of the independence of Greece and celebrating democracy in Greece and the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 3/26/2015 S2088) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1669) |
Same As/Similar To
SR394 (Related) 2016-05-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2794)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Greece
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Congressional tributes
Europe
Greece
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status