US SJR76 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution proposes an amendment to the Constitution to require that the Supreme Court consist of nine justices.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to require that the Supreme Court of the United States be composed of nine justices.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR95 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR52 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR53 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR14 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR52 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR53 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR14 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/76/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sjres76/BILLS-116sjres76pcs.pdf |