US SJR6 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution eliminates the deadline for the ratification of the Equal Rights Amendment, which prohibits discrimination based on sex. The amendment was proposed to the states in House Joint Resolution 208 of the 92nd Congress, as agreed to in the Senate on March 22, 1972. The amendment shall be part of the Constitution whenever ratified by the legislatures of three-fourths of the states.
Title
A joint resolution removing the deadline for the ratification of the equal rights amendment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR38 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR79 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR844 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR79 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR844 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Due process and equal protection
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's rights
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Due process and equal protection
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/6/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sjres6/BILLS-116sjres6is.pdf |