US SJR57 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-172. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Indirect Auto Lending and Compliance with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act". This joint resolution nullifies the rule submitted by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and printed in the Congressional Record on December 6, 2017, relating to indirect auto lending and compliance with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act. The rule provides guidance for compliance with fair lending requirements for third-party auto lenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Indirect Auto Lending and Compliance with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - On passage RC# 171 (Y: 234 N: 175 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 76 (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 75 (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-172. (TXT | PDF)
2018-05-21HouseSigned by President.
2018-05-10HousePresented to President.
2018-05-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-08HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 175, 1 Present (Roll no. 171). (text: CR H3815)
2018-05-08HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-05-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 57.
2018-05-08HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645, H.R. 2152 and S.J. Res. 57. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645 under a structured rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2152 under a closed rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 57 under a closed rule with one motion to commit.
2018-05-08HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 872. (consideration: CR H3815-3823)
2018-05-08HouseRule H. Res. 872 passed House.
2018-05-07HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 872 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645, H.R. 2152 and S.J. Res. 57. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645 under a structured rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2152 under a closed rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 57 under a closed rule with one motion to commit.
2018-04-18HouseHeld at the desk.
2018-04-18HouseReceived in the House.
2018-04-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-04-18SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 47. Record Vote Number: 76. (text: CR S2240)
2018-04-18SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S2227-2240)
2018-04-17SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S2200-2215)
2018-04-17SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 47. Record Vote Number: 75. (CR S2200)
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 378.
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
2018-03-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HJR132 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HR872 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback