US SJR52 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 52. Record Vote Number: 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 52. Record Vote Number: 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution rescinds the State Relief and Empowerment Waivers guidance issued on October 24, 2018, which relaxes the criteria for states to obtain waivers from certain health insurance plan coverage requirements.
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to "State Relief and Empowerment Waivers".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - Senate - Failed of passage in Senate RC# 337 (Y: 43 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Failed of passage in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 52. Record Vote Number: 337. |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6263-6271) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S6220-6225, S6228-6235) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S6220) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR74 (Same As) 2019-08-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Treasury
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Treasury
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
State and local government operations