US SJR14 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the U.S. Supreme Court to be composed of not more than nine Justices.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to require that the Supreme Court of the United States be composed of not more than 9 justices.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR53 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR52 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR95 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR76 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.
HJR52 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR95 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR76 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/14/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sjres14/BILLS-116sjres14is.pdf |